OR HB4031 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to outdoor advertising signs; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to outdoor advertising signs; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.state.or.us/MeasureInfo/Measure/AtGlance?session=36&MeasureNumber=HB4031 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/12reg/measures/hb4000.dir/hb4031.intro.html |