OR HB4029 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits nonprofit hospital from requiring patient to apply for medical assistance before screening for or providing financial assistance. Adjusts series reference. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 11--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 6--Barreto, Clem, Greenlick, Leif, Smith G, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Evans, Witt. |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |