OR HB4029 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person, public body or local service district from constructing bridge on Deschutes River within certain segments of Deschutes Scenic Waterway. Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to study and make recommendations to Legislative Assembly for recreational trail connecting Bend and Sunriver. Directs department to study three scenic waterways each biennium and make recommendations to Governor for designation of additional scenic waterways.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to scenic waterways; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |