OR HB4029 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 75, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 75, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes withdrawal of tract from city located within Metro and incorporated between January 1, 2000, and January 1, 2005, if city did not acknowledge comprehensive plan and land use regulations within four years after incorporation and any portion of tract is on boundary of city and within one-half mile of another city. Authorizes withdrawal of tract from city located within Metro and incorporated between January 1, 2000, and January 1, 2005, if city did not acknowledge comprehensive plan and land use regulations within four years after incorporation and any portion of tract is on boundary of city and within one-half mile of another city. Requires owner seeking withdrawal of tract to file certain substantiating documents with city, Metro and Department of Land Conservation and Development. Requires public hearing on withdrawal and decision by city to withdraw tract during or immediately after close of hearing. Provides for withdrawal without action by city if city fails or refuses to act. Prohibits city from annexing tract within 10 years following withdrawal. Authorizes any person who testified at hearing to seek judicial review of withdrawal by filing petition in Court of Appeals. Sunsets January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the withdrawal of property from a city; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 75, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014. |
2014-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Beyer, Devlin. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kennemer, Fagan. Passed.Ayes, 51; Excused, 5--Freeman, Hanna, Richardson, Thompson, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Gorsek, Harker, Thatcher, Vega Pederson. |
2014-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rural Communities. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |