OR HB4028 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Board to establish programs through which grants and loans may be made to enhance and expand workforce development and economic development in Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region. Provides that no more than 10 grant and loan programs may be active at any time. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to awarding moneys through programs in the eastern Oregon border region; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4028 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4028/Introduced |