OR HB4028 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 111, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 111, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits expenses for which dependent care income tax credit may be claimed to earned income taxable by Oregon , using lesser amount attributable to either spouse on joint return. Limits expenses for which dependent care income tax credit may be claimed to combination of] earned income taxable by Oregon and imputed income], using lesser amount attributable to either spouse on joint return. Provides for calculation based upon imputed income to allow degree-seeking enrolled student to claim credit.] Modifies annual limitation on total amount of tax credits for production or collection of bovine manure allowed for all taxpayers by tying limitation to calendar year instead of tax year. Modifies terms. Provides that qualified borrower on loan related to manufactured dwelling park for which lending institution may be allowed tax credit for qualified loan includes nonprofit corporation or housing authority with controlling interest in real property. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Allows Legislative Assembly to appropriate to Oregon Production Investment Fund balance of amount allowed for certification, but not certified, for tax credit for contributions to fund for current or upcoming fiscal year. Applies to fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2017. Provides for transfer and abatement of clawback of property taxes not imposed with respect to land that ceases to be exempt as land held for cemetery or crematory purposes if land is purchased for purpose of providing low income housing subject to certain property tax exemption programs for at least 10 consecutive property tax years. Adjusts sunset date for property tax exemption for low income rental housing. For purposes of certain economic development property tax benefits, provides that "eligible location" includes location not formerly used for industrial purposes and "eligible property" may be property appraised either by county or by Department of Revenue and clarifies definition of "rural area." Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax expenditures; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 111, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018. |
2018-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Baertschiger Jr; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2018-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |