OR HB4027 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Chapter 41, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Chapter 41, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to limitations on liability of persons providing services without compensation; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to limitations on liability of persons providing services without compensation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Chapter 41, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) | |
2012-02-27 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-20 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 21, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-17 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-16 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 17, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-13 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |