OR HB4026 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 43, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 43, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to award grants to wildfire-impacted school districts in amounts to cover funding decreases resulting from decreases in district average daily membership, as compared to 2019-2020 school year, that are caused by wildfires. Directs Department of Education to award grants to wildfire-impacted school districts in amounts to cover funding decreases resulting from decreases in district average daily membership, as compared to 2019-2020 school year, that are caused by wildfires. Sunsets on July 1, 2025. Establishes School Stabilization Subaccount for Wildfire-impacted School Districts for purpose of awarding grants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state moneys for school districts impacted by wildfires; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 43, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |