OR HB4026 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 87, (2012 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 87, (2012 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Court of Appeals.
Title
Relating to the Court of Appeals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 87, (2012 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2013. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-02 | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 8--Ferrioli, George, Girod, Morse, Nelson, Olsen, Telfer, Whitsett; excused, 3--Bates, Boquist, Starr. | |
2012-03-01 | Second reading. | |
2012-03-01 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-29 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-29 | Motion to refer to Rules carried on voice vote. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hicks. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 10--Barnhart, Brewer, Freeman, Gilliam, Holvey, Hunt, Nolan, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whisnant. | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-02 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-01 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |