OR HB4025 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 30, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 30, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that maximum amount of home or farm loan made by Department of Veterans' Affairs to eligible individual applies to each loan. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to loans from the Department of Veterans' Affairs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 30, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-12 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |