OR HB4022 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 90, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 90, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits state agency to locate devices or facilities for providing electricity to public for electric motor vehicles in locations sufficient to meet demand for devices or facilities. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to establish criteria for determining appropriate number of locations for devices and facilities. Provides that state agency shall set price for electricity that recovers, to extent practicable, costs of operating or administering devices or facilities and that does not exceed 110 percent of market price in county for delivering electricity to public for electric motor vehicles. Requires state agency to set uniform price for electricity in accordance with criteria and calculation that department specifies. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to report to Legislative Assembly not later than February 1, 2019, February 1, 2021, and February 1, 2023, concerning state agency implementation of authority granted in Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to electricity for motor vehicles; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 90, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018. |
2018-04-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Taken from 02-28 Calendar and placed on 03-01 Calendar on voice vote. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively. |
2018-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |