OR HB4020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 50, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 50, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies criteria for licensing of extended stay centers and requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules. Requires extended stay centers to report discharge data to authority upon request by authority. Permits extended stay center to participate in Oregon Patient Safety Reporting Program. Requires authority to apply for authorization from Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to receive federal matching funds for services of extended stay centers provided to medical assistance recipients and to permit extended stay centers and ambulatory surgical centers to operate under single license. Requires hospitals to have financial assistance policies, written in plain English, provided to patients upon request and displayed in hospital areas that are publicly accessible. Requires hospital billing statements to include specified information about obtaining financial assistance. Requires authority to make publicly available uniform application form for requesting financial assistance from any Oregon hospital. Adjusts inappropriate series references. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care facilities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 50, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Buehler. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |