OR HB4020 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 92, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 92, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Oregon Growth Board, in accordance with rules adopted by board, may require that management company or state agency under contract with board invest certain amount in Oregon. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Growth Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 92, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2016-02-05 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |