OR HB4020 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 85, (2014 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes entities responsible for analyzing biennial performance reviews submitted by Engineering and Technology Industry Council and for controlling associated fund and receiving appropriation moneys. Changes entities responsible for analyzing biennial performance reviews submitted by Engineering and Technology Industry Council and for controlling associated fund and receiving appropriation moneys. Takes effect July 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Engineering and Technology Industry Council; appropriating money; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 85, (2014 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-07SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-07SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-06SenateFirst reading.
2014-03-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Harker, Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Greenlick; Excused, 3--Berger, Boone, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Read, Williamson.
2014-03-06HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-03-05HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-05HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-03-05HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-05HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2014-02-12HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2014-02-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2014-02-10HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-07HouseWork Session cancelled.
2014-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4020
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/19949
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319041
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20283
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319219

Bill Comments

feedback