OR HB4019 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 30, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 30, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies duties of Executive Director of the Office of Student Access and Completion. Excludes Oregon community colleges, public universities and Oregon Health and Science University from definition of "school" in degree authorization provisions, rather than exempt institutions from these provisions. Requires certain schools to have conferred degrees in this state for at least 10 consecutive years, rather than at least five consecutive years, in order to be exempt from degree authorization provisions. Permits dependents of certain individuals to qualify for resident rate tuition at public universities or community colleges. Permits rollover of individual development accounts to one, rather than two, 529 college savings plan accounts. Requires schools seeking religious exemptions to submit statements annually to Higher Education Coordinating Commission, rather than to Executive Director of Office of Student Access and Completion.
Title
Relating to higher education.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Chapter 30, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017. |
2016-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Carried over to 02-25 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Barton. |
2016-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |