OR HB4019 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 84, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to annually identify federal or national entity that best provides information about affordability and value of institutions of higher education in Oregon. Requires institutions of higher education to provide students with fact sheet regarding program requirements, costs of education, loans, average salary or wages, loan default rates and related data prior to enrollment. Requires annual report to Higher Education Coordinating Commission.Ù Requires commission to establish process for collecting program and degree-specific completion, on-time graduation and retention rate statistics if information is available without creating undue burden on institution, or on institution-wide basis when it is not.Ù Requires commission to work toward increasing amount of program-specific data available.Ù Allows commission to amend fact sheet requirements by rule to comply with federal reporting requirements.Ù Specifies standards for data and rates provided.Ù Regulates advertising and solicitation of students by institutions of higher education.Ù Becomes operative July 1, 2015.Ù Requires institutions of higher education to provide students, at time of application, with a link to, or accurate copy of, page of Internet website maintained by federal or national entity that discusses affordability and value of institution and to prominently display link and copy on Internet website. Regulates advertising and solicitation of students by institutions of higher education. Becomes operative July 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to higher education; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 84, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--George.
2014-03-05SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2014-03-04SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-03-04HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 11--Cameron, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Krieger, Sprenger, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-03-04HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-03-03HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-27HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2014-02-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2014-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2014-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2014-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4019
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20061
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20246
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318777
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319086

Bill Comments

feedback