OR HB4018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 49, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 49, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires meetings of governing body of coordinated care organization in which decisions are made final to be open to public and to take public testimony. Requires coordinated care organization to record all meetings of governing body in sound, video, digital or written format and make record available on coordinated care organization's website. Requires coordinated care organization to provide contact information for chairperson of governing body and member of governing body or designated staff person. Requires expenditure of portion of coordinated care organization's annual net income or reserves on services designed to address health disparities and social determinants of health. Modifies composition of coordinated care organization governing body. Establishes new requirements for contracts between Oregon Health Authority and coordinated care organizations. Requires coordinated care organization to provide advance notice of intent not to renew contract to authority and, under certain circumstances, to members and providers. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to coordinated care organizations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 49, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Baertschiger Jr; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-20 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 26--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Clem, Esquivel, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Stark. |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 35--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Stark. |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |