OR HB4018 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 83, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes date by which Eastern Oregon University, Oregon Institute of Technology, Southern Oregon University or Western Oregon University may request institutional governing board to May 15, 2014, and changes process of board formation. Changes date by which Eastern Oregon University, Oregon Institute of Technology, Southern Oregon University or Western Oregon University may request institutional governing board to May 15, 2014, and changes process of board formation. Permits State Board of Higher Education to endorse, refuse to endorse or issue endorsement with conditions in response to university request for institutional governing board. Allows Higher Education Coordinating Commission to enter into and administer interstate agreements for post-secondary distance education. Permits commission to impose fee on educational institutions participating in interstate agreements. Moves Department of Community Colleges and Workforce Development into Higher Education Coordinating Commission, effective July 1, 2015. Establishes Task Force on Integrating the Department of Community Colleges and Workforce Development into the Higher Education Coordinating Commission. Establishes Public University Fund to enable universities with independent governing boards to continue to commingle moneys with other universities. Establishes process for running fund and for fund interactions with State Treasurer. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to higher education; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 83, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-07SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-07SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-06SenateFirst reading.
2014-03-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Berger, Boone, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Read, Williamson.
2014-03-06HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-03-05HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-04HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-03-04HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-04HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2014-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2014-02-12HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2014-02-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2014-02-10HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4018
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4018/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4018/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4018/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4018/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4018/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4018/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/19950
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319040
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20282
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319218

Bill Comments

feedback