OR HB4016 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter 5, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter 5, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits health profession licensing boards to establish or contract together to establish impaired health professional program for licensees of boards. Permits Oregon Board of Dentistry, Oregon Medical Board, Oregon State Board of Nursing and State Board of Pharmacy to contract to establish impaired health professional program for licensees of boards. Requires program to meet requirements for impaired health professional program contracted for or established by Oregon Health Authority.] Permits boards to consult with each other to adopt rules related to impaired health professional program. Establishes Impaired Health Professional Program Work Group to facilitate establishment and continuation of impaired health professional program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to impaired health professional programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Chapter 5, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 1, 2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 25; excused, 5--Boquist, Shields, Thatcher, Whitsett, Winters. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2016-02-08 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |