OR HB4016 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Oregon Business Development Department for Industry Competitiveness Fund to fund entrepreneurial and industry development activities. Increases cap on entrepreneurial development loans from $70,000 to $100,000. Increases allowable period of entrepreneurial development loans from five to 10 years. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to entrepreneurial development; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rural Communities with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |