OR HB4015 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to grant moneys to nonprofit organization for ADU community pilot programs that develop accessory dwelling units that are for income-eligible homeowners or available for rent by income-eligible tenants. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study laws related to housing and to report to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020.] Requires department to report on ADU community pilot programs to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2023. Appropriates moneys for grant to be awarded to Hacienda Community Development Corporation. Requires cities within Metro with population greater than 10,000 to conduct housing needs analysis. Replaces requirement that Metro allocate housing capacity among those cities with requirement that cities amend their land use regulations and housing production strategy if analysis shows housing need. Extends date by which Land Conservation and Development Commission must adopt schedule for housing needs analyses to December 31, 2020. Expands allowable uses of specific department appropriation to allow provision of technical assistance to local governments to increase housing affordability and availability. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to housing; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2020-02-25HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2020-02-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2020-02-21HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2020-02-14HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback