OR HB4014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 12, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 12, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that current foster child or former foster child complete volunteer service hours during previous academic year to qualify for tuition waiver.
Title
Relating to higher education tuition waivers for foster children.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 12, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Kennemer. |
2018-02-08 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |