OR HB4014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 91, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 91, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Chapter 91, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Gilliam. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) | |
2012-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Cowan, Sprenger. | |
2012-02-14 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-13 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-07 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Education. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |