OR HB4013 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 20 @ 8:15 am in HR C
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority, Oregon Liquor Control Commission, State Department of Agriculture and Governor's office to collaborate with kratom industry to develop plan to address issues related to regulatory authority over kratom. Establishes regulations for kratom products, including labeling requirements and minimum age for sale. Requires registration of kratom products with State Department of Agriculture. Provides civil cause of action for damages resulting from violation of kratom regulations. Authorizes imposition of civil penalty for certain violations.] Creates crime of unlawful preparation, distribution, sale or offer for sale of kratom product. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both. Creates crime of unlawful distribution, sale or offer for sale to individual under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both.] Takes effect on July 1, 2020.] Requires plan to be submitted to interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Creates crime of unlawful distribution, sale or offer for sale to individual under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to kratom; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2020-02-18SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Greenlick.
2020-02-17HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-14HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2020-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback