OR HB4010 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 41, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 41, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sale of kratom products by processor unless processor is registered with Department of Revenue. Prohibits sale of kratom products by processor unless processor is registered with Department of Revenue. Directs department to adopt rules to carry out regulations. Authorizes imposition of civil penalty for certain violations. Creates crime of unlawful distribution, sale or exposure for sale to individual under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Revenue for carrying out provisions of Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to kratom; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 41, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Zika. |
2022-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |