OR HB4010 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 110, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 110, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Addressing Racial Disparities in Home Ownership. Directs task force to compile data concerning levels of home ownership among people of color in this state and identify barriers to home ownership. Requires task force to recommend solutions, including legislation, to modify practices or procedures for mortgage loan applications and approvals to eliminate any impermissible discrimination or barriers. Requires task force to report to Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2019. Sunsets December 31, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to home ownership; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 110, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018. |
2018-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bynum, Meek. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |