OR HB4009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 89, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permits reinstatement of parental rights under certain circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to juvenile dependency proceedings; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 89, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Human Services.
2018-02-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner.
2018-02-20HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4009
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4009/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4009/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4009/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4009/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4009/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4009/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27211
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432103
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27327
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433296
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433821

Bill Comments

feedback