OR HB4009 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 64, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates March 28 of each year as Minoru Yasui Day. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a day to honor Minoru Yasui; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14HouseChapter 64, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 28, 2016.
2016-03-28HouseGovernor signed.
2016-02-29SenatePresident signed.
2016-02-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-02-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
2016-02-24SenateMade a Special Order of Business by voice vote.
2016-02-23SenateTaken from 02-23 Calendar and placed on 02-24 Calendar on voice vote.
2016-02-22SenateSecond reading.
2016-02-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2016-02-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2016-02-05SenateReferred to Rules.
2016-02-05SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2016-02-04HouseThird reading. Carried by Clem, Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Evans, Krieger, Olson, Smith.
2016-02-03HouseSecond reading.
2016-02-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2016-02-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2016-02-01HouseReferred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water.
2016-02-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2016-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback