OR HB4005 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires owner or possessor of firearm to secure firearm with trigger or cable lock, in locked container or in gun room except in specified circumstances. Punishes violation by maximum of $500 fine. If minor obtains unsecured firearm as result of violation, punishes by maximum of $2,000 fine. Provides that person who does not secure firearm as required is strictly liable for injury to person or property within two years after violation. Specifies exceptions to liability. Requires owner or possessor of firearm to secure firearm with trigger or cable lock or in locked container when transferring firearm under circumstances requiring criminal background check, except in specified circumstances. Punishes violation by maximum of $500 fine. Provides that person who transfers firearm without securing firearm is strictly liable for injury to person or property within two years after violation. Specifies exceptions to liability. Requires person to report loss or theft of firearm within 72 hours of time person knew or reasonably should have known of loss or theft. Punishes violation of requirement by maximum of $1,000 fine. Requires person transferring firearm to minor to directly supervise minor's use of firearm. Provides that person who does not supervise minor as required is strictly liable for injury to person or property caused by minor's use of firearm. Authorizes person to transfer supervisory duty and liability to another person. Specifies exceptions to supervision requirement and liability. Directs Oregon Health Authority to specify by rule minimum specifications for trigger and cable locks and locked containers required by Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to firearm safety requirements; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2020-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-17 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2020-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |