OR HB4005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 65, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 65, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a tax credit for livestock killed by predators; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for livestock killed by predators; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 65, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-02 | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 7--Burdick, Dingfelder, Hass, Monroe, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 3--Bates, Boquist, Starr. | |
2012-03-01 | Second reading. | |
2012-03-01 | Recommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-29 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Jenson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 5--Bailey, Greenlick, Nolan, Read, Smith J.. | |
2012-02-28 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 29, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-27 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-23 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-23 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-10 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference, then to Ways and Means by order of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference, then be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Revenue. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |