OR HB4003 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 64, (2012 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 64, (2012 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to State Department of Agriculture food safety fees.
Title
Relating to State Department of Agriculture food safety fees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 64, (2012 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2013. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-02 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Ferrioli, Kruse, Morse. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 13--Cameron, Freeman, Hicks, Huffman, Lindsay, Olson, Sheehan, Thatcher, Thompson, Wand, Weidner, Wingard, Speaker Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-21 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-02 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-01 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |