OR HB3636 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 728, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 728, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to predatory animal control; and appropriating money.
Title
Relating to predatory animal control; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Chapter 728, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-07-19 | President signed. | |
2011-07-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith G.. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-22 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-22 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-22 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-06-02 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-25 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-12 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |