OR HB3606 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 693, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 693, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax credits for energy facilities; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to tax credits for energy facilities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 693, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-22 | Referred to Tax Credits. | |
2011-06-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-22 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. | |
2011-06-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. | |
2011-06-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-27 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Tax Credits. | |
2011-03-28 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |