OR HB3563 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 834, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires person that engages in surface mining activities at levels below thresholds for applicability of operating permit and reclamation requirements to obtain exclusion certificate from State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries and to pay fee. Requires holder of exclusion certificate to annually pay renewal fee and submit certain renewal information. Increases operating permit fees. Requires moneys accepted and held by department as securities pursuant to reclamation bond or security requirements to be deposited in Reclamation Guarantee Fund. Establishes Reclamation Guarantee Fund. Requires certain annual financial reporting by department to governing board of department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for engaging in surface mining.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 834, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-30SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Boquist, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-26SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Evans, McLain, Parrish; Excused, 1--Weidner.
2015-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-19HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-16HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-16HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-11HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2015-06-10HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback