OR HB3561 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-21 - Chapter 609, (2023 Laws): Effective date August 4, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-21 - Chapter 609, (2023 Laws): Effective date August 4, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that term "early childhood care and education" includes early childhood behavioral and mental health services for purposes of scholarships and grants awarded to ensure state has adequate supply of early childhood care and education professionals. Specifies that term "early childhood care and education" includes early childhood behavioral and mental health services for purposes of scholarships and grants awarded to ensure state has adequate supply of early childhood care and education professionals. Requires person to accept state and federal aid grants, institutional aid grants and scholarships made available to person to be eligible to receive scholarship. Allows for award methodology that takes into consideration other financial assistance person has received. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to scholarships for early childhood professionals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-21 | House | Chapter 609, (2023 Laws): Effective date August 4, 2023. |
2023-08-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 1--Scharf; Excused, 17--Boshart Davis, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, McIntire, Nathanson, Osborne, Owens, Pham H, Reschke, Reynolds, Sosa, Wallan, Wright. |
2023-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Higher Education. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |