OR HB3561 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of resident for purposes of personal income taxation to exclude certain members of Armed Forces if home of record is located outside state. Requires taxpayers to file amended returns to claim refunds of exempted amounts for prior tax years. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2010. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of income of military personnel; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Gail Whitsett [R] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] |
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 28 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-07-02 | House | Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed.Ayes, 28; Nays, 28--Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Clem, Doherty, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Barton, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Smith. |
2015-06-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2015-06-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |