OR HB3557 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 805, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 28, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public bodies that receive requests for disclosure of specified personal contact information of public employees or certain other persons to forward copy of request to affected persons whose information is subject of request or their representatives. Requires public body to delay responding to request for seven days. Grants immunity to public bodies from any liability that arises from disclosure of information. Permits public bodies to recover costs incurred in responding to requests. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public records; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 805, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 28, 2015.
2015-07-28HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2015-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2015-06-23SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Rules.
2015-06-17SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Williamson.
2015-06-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2015 Calendar.
2015-06-12HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-06-08HouseWork Session held.
2015-05-22HouseReferred to Rules.
2015-05-22HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback