OR HB3549 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 833, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires individual engaging in application of pesticides by aircraft to have aerial pesticide applicator certificate. Establishes qualifications for obtaining and maintaining certificate. Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to suspend, revoke or refuse to renew license, certificate or other authorization if civil penalty is not paid within 90 days after order imposing penalty becomes final. Increases maximum amounts of certain civil penalties. Defines "person" for purposes of pesticide control chapter. Requires governing board of Pesticide Analytical and Response Center to develop standard operating procedures for implementation by public entities represented on board to coordinate receipt of, and response to, pesticide-related complaints indicating possible health or environmental effects. Requires board to report biennially to Legislative Assembly on activities of board and public entities represented on board regarding standard operating procedures. Requires State Department of Agriculture to operate telephone line for receiving, and facilitating coordination of responses to, pesticide-related complaints by public indicating possible health or environmental effects. Requires department to report biennially to Legislative Assembly regarding telephone line operations. Requires State Department of Agriculture to place information regarding pesticides on department website. Requires that information indicate pesticides and devices listed by department as highly toxic or restricted-use. Increases maximum amount the State Department of Agriculture may establish as pesticide registration fee. Allows State Department of Agriculture to require individual holding license, certificate or other authorization to retake examination if individual commits or has responsibility for violation indicating inadequate knowledge of pesticide laws and rules. Allows department to suspend, revoke or refuse to renew license, certificate or other authorization if individual fails retaken examination. Makes person conducting forest operation that includes aerial application of herbicides responsible for leaving strips of land adjacent to inhabited dwellings and schools unsprayed. Makes violation misdemeanor punishable by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Makes violation subject to civil penalty in amount established by State Board of Forestry by rule, not to exceed $5,000. Increases expenditure limit for biennium beginning July 1, 2015, from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and certain other federal funds, collected or received by State Department of Agriculture for purposes of department's duties under pesticide programs as established by Act. Makes provisions operative on either January 1, 2016, or January 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pesticide control; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 833, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Dembrow; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-02SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2015-07-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2015-07-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-07-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Barnhart, Buckley, Gorsek, Holvey, Nosse, Smith Warner, Taylor; Excused, 2--Barker, Boone.
2015-06-30HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-22HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-22HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-15HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2015-06-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2015-06-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-05-21HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-05-06HouseReferred to Rules.
2015-04-30HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3549
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3549/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3549/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3549/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3549/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3549/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3549/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22895
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23290
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363788
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364342

Bill Comments

feedback