OR HB3535 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Chapter 765, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies temporary assistance for needy families program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public assistance; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-28HouseChapter 765, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2015.
2015-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Kruse, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Edwards.
2015-07-03SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2015-07-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-02SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-07-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Piluso, Stark. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barker, Boone.
2015-07-01HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-30HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-18HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-18HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-12HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-05-11HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2015-05-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2015-05-08HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-27HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2015-04-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
2015-04-20HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-04-09HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2015-04-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3535
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3535/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3535/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3535/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3535/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3535/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3535/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21905
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22259
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23341
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363807
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364957

Bill Comments

feedback