OR HB3530 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 832, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits specified terms imposed on vision care provider by vision care insurance or vision care discount card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vision care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-24 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 832, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-01SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-30HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-24HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Kennemer; Excused, 4--Greenlick, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Heard.
2015-06-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Johnson, Olsen; excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen.
2015-06-17SenateCarried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent.
2015-06-16SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-16SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2015-06-11SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2015-06-01SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-05-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Health Care.
2015-05-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-04-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 41; Nays, 9--Barreto, Bentz, Johnson, McLane, Nearman, Sprenger, Stark, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 4--Gorsek, Greenlick, Kennemer, Nathanson; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Boone, Helm, Holvey, McKeown, Reardon, Vega Pederson.
2015-04-30HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Weidner.
2015-04-29HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2015 Calendar.
2015-04-28HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2015 Calendar.
2015-04-27HouseSecond reading.
2015-04-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-04-20HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-04-10HouseReferred to Health Care.
2015-04-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3530
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3530/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3530/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3530/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3530/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3530/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3530/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21898
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=347299
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22728
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22986
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=360551
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=361708

Bill Comments

feedback