OR HB3525 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Chapter 753, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Chapter 753, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Immigration Consultant Fraud. Provides that person who obstructs reporting of unlicensed immigration consultant commits crime of obstructing governmental or judicial administration.] Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.] Directs task force to report to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2015. Sunsets December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to obstructing governmental administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | House | Chapter 753, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 21, 2015. |
2015-07-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Johnson, Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-04-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |