OR HB3525 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 689, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 689, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to courthouse capital improvements; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to courthouse capital improvements; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 689, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-28 | Third reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 1--Ferrioli. | |
2011-06-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-27 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-23 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-23 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Richardson. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Bailey, Barnhart, Boone, Brewer, Cannon, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Kotek, Matthews, McLane, Nathanson, Nolan, Parrish, Read, Sheehan, Smith J., Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-10 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-05-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-06 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-28 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-21 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |