OR HB3523 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 756, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 756, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires statements of independent expenditures to be filed with Secretary of State using electronic filing system.
Title
Relating to election campaign finance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Matthews [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Robert Jenson [R] |
Rep. John Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 756, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Parrish. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-06-27 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2013-06-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-10 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-05-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |