OR HB3510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires legislative measures to contain brief and impartial statement of problem measure is intended to solve. Excepts concurrent and single chamber resolutions and memorials from requirement.
Title
Relating to the form of legislative measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Sprenger. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-03-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |