OR HB3506 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain restrictions on medical assistance coverage of dentures, partial dentures and tooth extractions.
Title
Relating to medical assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |