OR HB3503 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 830, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 830, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Corrections to establish Family Sentencing Alternative Pilot Program in partnership with circuit courts, county community corrections agencies and Department of Human Services. Specifies requirements of defendants entering program. Authorizes court to sentence defendant to probation with mandatory participation in program for first 12 months of probation. Appropriates moneys to Department of Corrections and Department of Human Services for purpose of implementing program. Sunsets July 1, 2025.
Title
Relating to offenders with minor children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Chapter 830, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-08-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Johnson, Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-03-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |