OR HB3498 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statewide minimum wage rate beginning on July 1, 2024. Provides statewide minimum wage rate beginning on July 1, 2024. Establishes scheduled rate increases beginning on July 1, 2025. Requires Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to index minimum wage rates to inflation after June 30, 2030. Modifies weekly hourly threshold at which overtime compensation must be paid. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Relating to minimum conditions of employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |