OR HB3472 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 700, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 700, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to consider creation of Pay Forward, Pay Back pilot program to replace current system of tuition and fees required to attend institution of higher education.
Title
Relating to higher education tuition; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Chris Harker [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 700, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2013-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-06 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |