OR HB3465 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 686, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 686, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guest ranches; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to guest ranches; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 686, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-29 | President signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-23 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith J. | |
2011-06-23 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bentz. | |
2011-06-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barker, Barnhart, Berger, Conger, Dembrow, Gelser, Gilliam, Greenlick, Harker, Hicks, Hunt, Kennemer, Lindsay, Nolan, Read, Thompson, Weidner, Wingard; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 2--Dingfelder, George; excused, 3--Boquist, Prozanski, Starr. | |
2011-06-21 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-03 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-06-03 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Rules by order of the President. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-21 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-20 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bentz. | |
2011-04-20 | Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Bailey, Gelser, Hunt, Nolan, Read, Tomei. | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-14 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |