OR HB3464 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chapter 754, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chapter 754, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies schedule for issuance of lottery bonds to pay costs of Coos Bay Channel Project.
Title
Relating to public borrowing for Coos Bay channel project; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | House | Chapter 754, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed. Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Jenson; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-03-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |